RI S2381 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits passenger and commercial Gloria Gemma Breast Cancer Foundation plates to be issued and sets pre-orders at 900 of all types.
Title
Gloria Gemma Breast Cancer Resource Foundation
Sponsors
Sen. Juan Pichardo [D] | Sen. William Walaska [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] |
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2016) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/SenateText16/S2381.pdf |