RI S2379 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HEALTH AND SAFETY -- LACTATION CONSULTANT PRACTICE ACT OF 2014 - Specifies the requirements and procedures for licensing lactation consultants as well as the renewal, expiration, termination, refusal, revocation and suspension of licenses.
Title
Specifies the requirements and procedures for licensing lactation consultants as well as the renewal, expiration, termination, refusal, revocation and suspension of licenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2024) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2379.pdf |