RI S2375 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reinstates for one year, from July 1, 2018, to June 30, 2019, the formula used to distribute hotel tax funds prior to January 1, 2016.
Title
Tourism And Development
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/31/2018) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2375.pdf |