RI S2371 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-05 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-05 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Remove the requirement that the owner of storage space give notice to an occupant by publication in a newspaper of general circulation
Title
Self-service Storage Facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-05 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Senate passed as amended |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/05/2014) |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Committee recommends passage as amended |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/15/2014) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/25/2014) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |