RI S2363 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating To Motor And Other Vehicles -- Parking Facilities And Privileges (would Clarify The Use Of Parking Placards By Persons Or Agencies Serving The Disabled.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Relating To Motor And Other Vehicles -- Parking Facilities And Privileges (would Clarify The Use Of Parking Placards By Persons Or Agencies Serving The Disabled.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-27 Committee recommended measure be held for further study
2012-03-23 Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2012)
2012-02-14 Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback