RI S2347 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes and empowers the department of transportation to plant pollinator-friendly species of trees, shrubs, grasses and plants.
Title
Construction And Maintenance Of State Roads
Sponsors
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] | Sen. Meghan Kallman [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2022) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/SenateText22/S2347.pdf |