RI S2335 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits a medical training program from using live animals if another accredited training program in the same medical discipline does not use animals or if an alternative teaching method exists.
Title
Animal Care -- Use Of Animals In Medical Training
Sponsors
Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] | Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] |
Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2022) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/SenateText22/S2335.pdf |