RI S2330 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-11 - Committee continued
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-11 - Committee continued
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HUMAN SERVICES -- MEDICAL ASSISTANCE -- LONG-TERM CARE SERVICE AND FINANCE REFORM -- CHIROPRACTIC SERVICES RATES - Provides the executive office of health and human services would submit to the US Department of Health and Human Services a state plan to set rates for chiropractic services.
Title
Provides the executive office of health and human services would submit to the US Department of Health and Human Services a state plan to set rates for chiropractic services.
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Pamela Lauria [D] |
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Committee continued |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2024) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Human Services
HUMAN SERVICES -- MEDICAL ASSISTANCE
HUMAN SERVICES -- MEDICAL ASSISTANCE -- LONG-TERM CARE SERVICE AND FINANCE REFORM
HUMAN SERVICES -- MEDICAL ASSISTANCE -- LONG-TERM CARE SERVICE AND FINANCE REFORM -- CHIROPRACTIC SERVICES RATES
HUMAN SERVICES -- MEDICAL ASSISTANCE
HUMAN SERVICES -- MEDICAL ASSISTANCE -- LONG-TERM CARE SERVICE AND FINANCE REFORM
HUMAN SERVICES -- MEDICAL ASSISTANCE -- LONG-TERM CARE SERVICE AND FINANCE REFORM -- CHIROPRACTIC SERVICES RATES
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2330.pdf |