RI S2325 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mandates that health insurance companies and Medicaid provide coverage for FDA approved COVID-19 home testing kits.
Title
Accident And Sickness Insurance Policies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Human Services: Be held for further study (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/03/2022) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |