RI S2322 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Health And Safety -- Tanning Facility Safety Standards
Title
An Act Relating To Health And Safety -- Tanning Facility Safety Standards
Sponsors
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] | Sen. Rhoda Perry [D] | Sen. Juan Pichardo [D] |
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-22 | Effective without Governor's signature | |
2012-06-14 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-06-13 | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence | |
2012-06-13 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/12/2012) | |
2012-06-12 | House passed Sub A | |
2012-06-12 | Placed on House Calendar (06/12/2012) | |
2012-06-12 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2012-06-12 | Scheduled for consideration (06/12/2012) | |
2012-03-14 | Referred to House H.E.W. | |
2012-03-13 | Senate read and passed | |
2012-03-01 | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/13/2012) | |
2012-02-29 | Committee recommends passage | |
2012-02-27 | Scheduled for consideration (02/29/2012) | |
2012-02-15 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-02-10 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/15/2012) | |
2012-02-07 | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/SenateText12/S2322.pdf |