RI S2311 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require those who are convicted or who plead to the charge of cruelty to animals to be financially responsible for the cost of care for those animals while they are in the care of the Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals.
Title
Cruelty To Animals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-18 | House | House passed as amended in concurrence |
2014-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-18 | House | Committee recommends passage as amended in concurrence |
2014-06-17 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-12 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Senate passed as amended |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/11/2014) |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Committee recommends passage as amended |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/04/2014) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |