RI S2304 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
WATERS AND NAVIGATION -- COASTAL RESOURCES MANAGEMENT COUNCIL - Requires that a super majority of three-fifths (3/5) of the duly appointed council is required to override a recommendation by the CRMC staff.
Title
Requires that a super majority of three-fifths (3/5) of the duly appointed council is required to override a recommendation by the CRMC staff.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Linda Ujifusa [D] |
Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] | Sen. Mark McKenney [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] | Sen. Victoria Gu [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2024) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2304.pdf |