RI S2292 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for the issuance of a special plate for Olympic Medal winners.
Title
Registration Of Vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-02 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-27 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-21 | Senate | House passed in concurrence |
2014-06-21 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-21 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Referred to House Finance |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/17/2014) |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-06-06 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/11/2014) |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2014) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |