RI S2290 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limits each of the Coventry Fire Districts tax levy increases to the consumer price index, but not to exceed five percent (5%) in any one year
Title
Fire Districts Located In Coventry
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/12/2016) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/SenateText16/S2290.pdf |