RI S2264 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PUBLIC UTILITIES AND CARRIERS -- TAXICABS AND LIMITED PUBLIC MOTOR VEHICLES - Amends requirements regarding how taxicabs can be placed in service.
Title
Amends requirements regarding how taxicabs can be placed in service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Be held for further study (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2024) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |
Subjects
Public Utilities And Carriers
PUBLIC UTILITIES AND CARRIERS -- TAXICABS AND LIMITED PUBLIC MOTOR VEHICLES
PUBLIC UTILITIES AND CARRIERS -- TAXICABS AND LIMITED PUBLIC MOTOR VEHICLES