RI S2262 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-14 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-14 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts from sales and use taxes: burial containers, urns, urn liners, urn vaults, grave liners, grave vaults, burial liners, burial vaults, burial tent setups, and prayer cards.
Title
Sales And Use Taxes -- Liability Computation
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Finance: Be held for further study (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Finance: Be held for further study (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-14 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/14/2022) |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/07/2022) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/15/2022) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |