RI S2261 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defines light duty, non-emergency, emergency and zero-emission vehicles and requires the state to convert its fleet of vehicles to no less than fifty percent (50%) of vehicles in those categories by the year 2030.
Title
Department Of Administration
Sponsors
Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate Committee on Finance: Be held for further study (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/10/2022) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |