RI S2258 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-25 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-25 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Resolution Amending The Rules Of The Senate For The Years 2013 And 2014
Title
Senate Resolution Amending The Rules Of The Senate For The Years 2013 And 2014
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage for the years 2013 and 2014 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (02/25/2014) |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/11/2014) |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Rules |