RI S2232 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Changes the title of chapter 37.2 of title 5 and throughout, replacing "Oriental medicine" with "Chinese medicine" and allows certified individuals to practice acupuncture and Chinese medicine using Chinese medical diagnostic methods.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Healing Art Of Acupuncture And Oriental Medicine

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27HouseReferred to House H.E.W.
2020-02-26SenateSenate passed as amended (floor amendment)
2020-02-12SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (02/26/2020)
2020-02-11SenateCommittee recommends passage
2020-02-07SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/11/2020)
2020-02-04SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback