RI S2229 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the town of Richmond to enact an ordinance providing for the registration of businesses in the town. The act would also provide a fine of up to ($25.00) per month for failing to register, not to exceed three hundred dollars ($300.00).
Title
General Powers--registration Of Businesses In Richmond
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-20 | House | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | House | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-19 | Senate | House passed Sub A |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2014-06-15 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/17/2014) |
2014-06-15 | Senate | Meeting postponed (06/16/2014) |
2014-06-14 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/27/2014) |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/20/2014) |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2014) |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |