RI S2227 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates And Amending The Membership Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study Rhode Island's Zoning And Subdivision Enabling Acts
Title
Joint Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates And Amending The Membership Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study Rhode Island's Zoning And Subdivision Enabling Acts
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Paul Fogarty [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] |
Sen. William Walaska [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Commission-zoning & subdivision approval of amendment lc 003915/2 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-17 | House | House passed as amended in concurrence |
2014-06-12 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2014) |
2014-06-10 | House | Committee recommends passage as amended in concurrence |
2014-06-06 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/10/2014) |
2014-06-04 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/03/2014) |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/20/2014) |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2014) |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |