RI S2213 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates immunity from prosecution for medical emergencies for drug possession or delivery.
Title
The Good Samaritan Overdose Prevention Act Of 2016
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] |
Sen. James Seveney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/05/2022) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/SenateText22/S2213.pdf |