RI S2211 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
COURTS AND CIVIL PROCEDURE -- COURTS -- FAMILY COURT - Only protective orders issued against adults are to be transmitted to A.G.'s B.C.I. for inclusion in the R.O.N.C.O. system. Protective orders against juveniles will be accessible to law enforcement.
Title
Only protective orders issued against adults are to be transmitted to A.G.'s B.C.I. for inclusion in the R.O.N.C.O. system. Protective orders against juveniles will be accessible to law enforcement.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Matthew LaMountain [D] | Sen. David Tikoian [D] | Sen. Robert Britto [D] |
Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-13 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-06-13 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2024-06-12 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/13/2024) |
2024-06-12 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2024-06-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/12/2024) |
2024-06-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-06-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/11/2024) |
2024-05-08 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/07/2024) |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/30/2024) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2024) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Courts And Civil Procedure
COURTS AND CIVIL PROCEDURE -- COURTS
COURTS AND CIVIL PROCEDURE -- COURTS -- FAMILY COURT
COURTS AND CIVIL PROCEDURE -- COURTS
COURTS AND CIVIL PROCEDURE -- COURTS -- FAMILY COURT