RI S2209 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-14 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (07/14/2020)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-14 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (07/14/2020)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts from taxation real property acquired or leased by a railroad entity used in the boarding or disembarking of railroad passengers or supporting passenger railroad operations and services.
Title
Property Subject To Taxation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-14 | Senate | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (07/14/2020) |
2020-07-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/SenateText20/S2209.pdf |