RI S2209 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a uniform rate review procedure for rating formula/rate changes by non-profit hospital/medical service corps. And catastrophic health plans requiring public hearings/meetings paid by applicant with no effect on appeal rights effective 1/1/17.
Title
Rate Review Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-16 - House - Passage as amended passage of amendment (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - Senate - - rate review act approval of amendment lc 003610/3 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - Senate - - rate review act approval of amendment lc 003610/3 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-27 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-21 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-17 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2016-06-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-16 | House | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2016-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/16/2016) |
2016-06-07 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2016-06-05 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/07/2016) |
2016-05-18 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/17/2016) |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/05/2016) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/03/2016) |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |