RI S2193 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds pickles and relish to those foods which are permitted to be manufactured and sold as a farm home food product.
Title
Sanitation In Food Establishments
Sponsors
Sen. Jessica de la Cruz [R] | Sen. Gordon Rogers [R] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] |
Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/26/2020) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/SenateText20/S2193.pdf |