RI S2191 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TAXATION -- LEVY AND ASSESSMENT OF LOCAL TAXES - Provides that the city of Warwick, no separate class or zoning district would be assigned/designated based solely on a scenic view, and no property in a particular class or zoning district would be assessed at an increased rate from other properties.
Title
Provides that the city of Warwick, no separate class or zoning district would be assigned/designated based solely on a scenic view, and no property in a particular class or zoning district would be assessed at an increased rate from other properties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2024) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2191.pdf |