RI S2150 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ANIMALS AND ANIMAL HUSBANDRY -- UNLAWFUL CONFINEMENT OF A COVERED ANIMAL - Exempts egg laying hens kept for commercial egg production purposes from the provisions of chapter 4-1.1 until January 1, 2034.
Title
Exempts egg laying hens kept for commercial egg production purposes from the provisions of chapter 4-1.1 until January 1, 2034.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2024) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Subjects
Animals And Animal Husbandry
ANIMALS AND ANIMAL HUSBANDRY -- UNLAWFUL CONFINEMENT OF A COVERED ANIMAL
ANIMALS AND ANIMAL HUSBANDRY -- UNLAWFUL CONFINEMENT OF A COVERED ANIMAL
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2150.pdf |