RI S2126 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits insurance companies from considering the zip code of the insured or the zip code of any insured real property or the zip code where any insured property is stored or garaged in determining casualty insurance rates.
Title
Casualty Insurance Rating
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. John Burke [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] |
Sen. Alana DiMario [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2022) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/SenateText22/S2126.pdf |