RI S2119 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
LABOR AND LABOR RELATIONS -- LABOR RELATIONS ACT - Allows governmental employee union contracts to contain specific references to specific health insurance companies.
Title
Allows governmental employee union contracts to contain specific references to specific health insurance companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/30/2024) |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/24/2024) |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2024) |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |