RI S2115 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
CRIMINAL PROCEDURE -- VICTIM'S RIGHTS - Amends the current requirement of payment of initial filing fee/service of process costs when the victim of crime is still owed restitution at the expiration of the case/seeks to enforce the civil judgment entered at the time of the criminal disposition.
Title
Amends the current requirement of payment of initial filing fee/service of process costs when the victim of crime is still owed restitution at the expiration of the case/seeks to enforce the civil judgment entered at the time of the criminal disposition.
Sponsors
Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. David Tikoian [D] | Sen. Matthew LaMountain [D] |
Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Mark McKenney [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Tiara Mack [D] |
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-06 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-06-06 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2024-06-04 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/06/2024) |
2024-06-04 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2024-05-31 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/04/2024) |
2024-05-03 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/02/2024) |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/25/2024) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2024) |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |