RI S2111 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes the word diesel in regard to idling of engines and would pertain to idling of all engines.
Title
Idling
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] |
Sen. Mark McKenney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/12/2020) |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/SenateText20/S2111.pdf |