RI S2103 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Placed on Senate Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Internet service providers to follow Internet service neutrality requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Internet Service Providers - Net Neutrality

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar
2020-03-10SenateCommittee recommends passage
2020-03-06SenateScheduled for consideration (03/10/2020)
2020-02-11SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2020-02-07SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/11/2020)
2020-01-22SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Commerce

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback