RI S2101 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Redefines "first-time offender" and would permit individuals with a record of up to two (2) misdemeanor convictions to be eligible for expungement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Identification And Apprehension Of Criminals

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-16SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2018)
2018-03-12SenateMeeting postponed (03/13/2018)
2018-03-09SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-01-18SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback