RI S2095 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-27 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-27 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Westerly to exempt from the provisions of this section any proposed Class B liquor license to be located at 114 Granite Street, Westerly.
Title
Retail Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-17 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Retail licenses (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Retail licenses (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-27 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-06-17 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2020-06-15 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2020) |
2020-06-11 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2020-06-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/11/2020) |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (02/05/2020) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/29/2020) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |