RI S2095 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a social media privacy policy for students and employees, and prohibits the use of data in certain circumstances.
Title
Social Media Privacy And Student Data - Cloud Computing
Sponsors
Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Paul Jabour [D] |
Sen. Adam Satchell [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Privacy - cloud computing approval of amendment lc 003479/2 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Social media privacy recommit to committee (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Social media privacy recommit to committee (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-19 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2014-06-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-19 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2014-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-19 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-06-13 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/16/2014) |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Senate voted to recommit to Senate Judiciary |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/20/2014) |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/13/2014) |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |