RI S2087 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the department of environmental management to create environmental justice areas.
Title
Environmental Justice Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment & Agriculture: Passage (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment & Agriculture: Passage (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | House | Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/15/2022) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2022) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |