RI S2085 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits landlords from terminating periodic tenancies from December 1 to February 1 for elderly or disabled tenants.
Title
Residential Landlord And Tenant Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2020) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/SenateText20/S2085.pdf |