RI S2079 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
FOOD AND DRUGS -- AUTHORIZATION FOR THE USE OF BUPRENORPHINE - Encourages and authorizes the department of health to adopt rules and regulations that lead to the more liberal utilization of buprenorphine.
Title
Encourages and authorizes the department of health to adopt rules and regulations that lead to the more liberal utilization of buprenorphine.
Sponsors
Sen. Gordon Rogers [R] | Sen. Jessica de la Cruz [R] | Sen. Thomas Paolino [R] | Sen. Anthony Deluca [R] |
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Human Services: Be held for further study (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/07/2024) |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |