RI S2074 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-27 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-27 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enables the town council of Portsmouth to transfer and/or convey parcels of land owned by the town on Prudence Island to the Prudence Island School Foundation to be used for educational purposes.
Title
General Powers -- Prudence Island School Foundation
Sponsors
Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] |
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-17 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-27 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-06-17 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2020-06-15 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2020) |
2020-06-11 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2020-06-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/11/2020) |
2020-03-06 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/05/2020) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2020) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |