RI S2071 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that for tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2019a taxpayer entitled to a federal earned-income credit shall be allowed a state earned-income credit equal to 18% of the federal earned-income credit.
Title
Personal Income Tax
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Harold Metts [D] |
Sen. Adam Satchell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2018) |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2071.pdf |