RI S2066 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows a modification to federal adjusted gross income for military pension income for tax years commencing on January 1, 2023 and thereafter.
Title
Personal Income Tax
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Roger Picard [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. John Burke [D] |
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Finance: Be held for further study (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/15/2022) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |