RI S2059 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes the possession, purchase, or sale of powdered alcohol a crime punishable by a fine not to exceed one thousand dollars ($1,000).
Title
Relating To Alcoholic Beverages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-13 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-04-13 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2016-04-08 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/13/2016) |
2016-04-06 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2016-04-01 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/06/2016) |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (02/10/2016) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/21/2016) |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |