RI S2014 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the Rhode Island secure choice retirement savings program as a public corporation managing IRA-type investments. Requires employers to offer the program to employees or be subject to a $250 penalty per employee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rhode Island Secure Choice Retirement Savings Program Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Committee on Finance: Be held for further study (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-01SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2022-02-25SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2022)
2022-01-06SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Finance

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback