RI S1005 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-22 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-22 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Central Coventry Fire District Charter to provide for purchasing, installing, operating and maintaining street lighting and the funding for its debt.
Title
In Amendment Of Chapter 492 Of The Public Laws Of 2006 Amending The Charter Of The Central Coventry Fire District
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-12 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-22 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-06-12 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2023-06-09 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/12/2023) |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/08/2023) |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/01/2023) |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/18/2023) |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |