RI S1005 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission On Housing, Tasked With Conducting A Comprehensive Review Of Rhode Island's Housing System (creates A 15 Member Commission To Review And Provide Initial Recommendations And Potential Legislative Proposals On Rhode Island's Housing System By January 31, 2020, And Final Recommendation By October 16, 2020, And Would Expire On December 31, 2020.)
Title
Senate Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission On Housing, Tasked With Conducting A Comprehensive Review Of Rhode Island's Housing System (creates A 15 Member Commission To Review And Provide Initial Recommendations And Potential Legislative Proposals On Rhode Island's Housing System By January 31, 2020, And Final Recommendation By October 16, 2020, And Would Expire On December 31, 2020.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/26/2019) |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S1005.pdf |