RI S1003 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-16 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-16 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Authorizing The Town Of North Kingstown To Finance Renovations, Alterations, Additions And Other Improvements And/or Related Equipment For The Wickford Elementary School Reuse For A Combined Town Hall And School Department Administration Facility And To Issue Not More Than $3,850,000 Bonds And Notes Therefor
Title
An Act Authorizing The Town Of North Kingstown To Finance Renovations, Alterations, Additions And Other Improvements And/or Related Equipment For The Wickford Elementary School Reuse For A Combined Town Hall And School Department Administration Facility And To Issue Not More Than $3,850,000 Bonds And Notes Therefor
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-16 | Referred to House Finance | |
2011-06-15 | Senate read and passed | |
2011-06-09 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-06-07 | Committee recommends passage | |
2011-06-07 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-06-01 | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/SenateText11/S1003.pdf |