RI S1000 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that employers who permit employees to report to work shall pay the employee for not less than 3 hours wages if 3 hours work does not exist. Exceptions for agreed shifts of less than 3 hours and for employee students of a college.
Title
Minimum Wages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-28 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-19 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |