RI S0999 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Authorizing Appropriation Of Five Million Dollars ($5,000,000) To Commerce Rhode Island For Express Purpose Of Providing Base Level Operation Funds For Local Visitor Centers (this Resolution Authorizes The Appropriation Of The Sum Of Five Million Dollars ($5,000,000) To Commerce Rhode Island For Funding Of Local Visitor Centers.)
Title
Joint Resolution Authorizing Appropriation Of Five Million Dollars ($5,000,000) To Commerce Rhode Island For Express Purpose Of Providing Base Level Operation Funds For Local Visitor Centers (this Resolution Authorizes The Appropriation Of The Sum Of Five Million Dollars ($5,000,000) To Commerce Rhode Island For Funding Of Local Visitor Centers.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-23 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/23/2023) |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/SenateText23/S0999.pdf |