RI S0998 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-14 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-14 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Resolution Respectfully Requesting The Department Of Administration To Expand The Availability Of Rhode Island Based Dairy Products In State Agencies
Title
Senate Resolution Respectfully Requesting The Department Of Administration To Expand The Availability Of Rhode Island Based Dairy Products In State Agencies
Sponsors
Sen. David Bates [R] | Sen. Dawson Hodgson [R] | Sen. Nicholas Kettle [R] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
Sen. William Walaska [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-14 | Senate read and passed | |
2011-06-09 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar | |
2011-06-08 | Committee recommends passage | |
2011-06-08 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-06-01 | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/SenateText11/S0998.pdf |